Steven Killelea, the founder of this company sold $53m worth of shares around March of 2018.
Steven Killelea, the Chairman then resigned from the Board on 23/10/2018 effective from 1/11/2018 (a week later).
The CEO then resigned from the Board on 20/11/2018 and left within three months.
There are, based upon the last report, approximately 170m shares issued. The current Board members hold 23,000 shares between them and this hasn't altered, as far as I can see, since the departures mentioned above. So the current Board members hold about 0.014% of total shares issued.
The need to provide profit updates on 18/12, 30/12 and then again in mid January is perplexing at best.
Steven Killelia has sold another 13m shares since he left the business although he still holds about one third of the total issued capital.
- Forums
- ASX - By Stock
- IRI
- Ann: Market Update - Continuous Disclosure
Ann: Market Update - Continuous Disclosure, page-18
-
- There are more pages in this discussion • 90 more messages in this thread...
You’re viewing a single post only. To view the entire thread just sign in or Join Now (FREE)
Featured News
Add IRI (ASX) to my watchlist
(20min delay)
|
|||||
Last
65.5¢ |
Change
-0.015(2.24%) |
Mkt cap ! $116.1M |
Open | High | Low | Value | Volume |
66.0¢ | 69.0¢ | 64.5¢ | $259.0K | 390.8K |
Buyers (Bids)
No. | Vol. | Price($) |
---|---|---|
2 | 43814 | 65.0¢ |
Sellers (Offers)
Price($) | Vol. | No. |
---|---|---|
66.5¢ | 3969 | 1 |
View Market Depth
No. | Vol. | Price($) |
---|---|---|
2 | 43814 | 0.650 |
2 | 6382 | 0.645 |
2 | 4671 | 0.640 |
1 | 1588 | 0.630 |
2 | 11400 | 0.625 |
Price($) | Vol. | No. |
---|---|---|
0.665 | 3969 | 1 |
0.690 | 50000 | 1 |
0.700 | 62423 | 3 |
0.720 | 1800 | 1 |
0.725 | 3500 | 1 |
Last trade - 16.10pm 02/10/2024 (20 minute delay) ? |
Featured News
IRI (ASX) Chart |