I assume that you meant TFS (Tranzact Financial Services), not TRS (The Reject Shop). TFS was acquired by Gro-Aust Holdings Limited, and delisted on 13/02/2014. Dalton Gooding may, or may not, have been a director of TFS.
Clinical Cell Culture Limited – CCE. Restructured as Avita Medical (AVH) in June 2008, and AVH has made losses ever since. Dalton Leslie Gooding was Chairman from 14/11/2002 to 01/07/2014.
Katana Capital – KAT. Dalton Leslie Gooding has been Chairman since 11/11/2005. KAT has only made about $7m in ten years, so it is not a success story. The SP was said to be be $1.03 on 04/05/07. It closed at 74c on 19/09/2017.
Digging up less than spectacular companies with a nexus to Mr Gooding is probably a sterile activity. There may well be a valid reason for the connections. In my experience, the role of Chairman is substantially titular, it's like being the Governor General, a good lurk if one can get the position.
BYL Price at posting:
8.0¢ Sentiment: Buy Disclosure: Held