Does anybody know when Mr Smith resigned from Yahoo7?
The ASX criteria is 'within the last 3 years not been employed in an executive capacity by' in this case the 7 Group.
He was appointed to Yahoo7 on June 9 2006.
http://www.bandt.com.au/news/yahoo7-appoints-ian-smith-as-ceo
Irrespective of when he resigned, at the time of the publication of the Annual Report for FY08 (24 Oct 2008) the statement at page 7 in the Directors Report where he is listed as "Independent Chairman" is clearly wrong, according to the criteria.
His appointment to Yahoo7 had only been 2 years and 4 months earlier, as above, I am not sure when he resigned.
If he resigned after 2 December 2007, i.e. less than 3 years before ENG received the proposal from Network Investments on 2 December 2010, then he is clearly NOT independent according to the criteria.
f111
- Forums
- ASX - By Stock
- afr article - howes and shareholder defence
Does anybody know when Mr Smith resigned from Yahoo7?The ASX...
-
-
- There are more pages in this discussion • 1 more message in this thread...
You’re viewing a single post only. To view the entire thread just sign in or Join Now (FREE)