- Release Date: 11/11/14 12:27
- Summary: DIRECTOR: PGW: PGG Wrightson Directorship Changes
- Price Sensitive: No
- Download Document 2.39KB
PGW 11/11/2014 12:27 DIRECTOR REL: 1227 HRS PGG Wrightson Limited DIRECTOR: PGW: PGG Wrightson Directorship Changes The Chairman of PGG Wrightson, Alan Lai, today announced changes to the membership of the Board of Directors. The changes see the resignation of Wai Yip (Patrick) Tsang who joined the Board in December 2012. Patrick, who is also the current Chief Financial Officer of Agria Corporation is retiring from both roles effective 15 November 2014 to pursue other opportunities. Alan Lai thanked Patrick for his contributions during his tenure as a Director of PGG Wrightson and wished him well for the future. Wah Kwong (WK) Tsang will be reappointed to the Board on 15 November 2014 having previously been a Director of PGG Wrightson during 2011-2012. WK is the current Chairman of Agria Corporation's Audit Committee and Compensation Committee and a member of its Nomination Committee. WK would also join PGG Wrightson's Audit Committee. WK is an associated person of substantial security holder Agria (Singapore) Pte Limited. Accordingly, the Board has determined that he does not qualify as an Independent Director as defined by the NZX Listing Rules. Brief biographical details for WK follow: Biography - WK Tsang Mr. Wah Kwong (WK) Tsang is a former partner of Hong Kong and China firm PricewaterhouseCoopers and has over 30 years of professional experience in auditing listed and unlisted companies and providing support for initial public offerings and acquisition transactions. WK is an Independent Director of Agria Corporation and the Chairman of its Audit Committee, Chairman of its Compensation Committee and a member of its Nomination Committee. WK was a Director of PGG Wrightson Ltd from November 2011 to December 2012. Currently, WK is also an Independent Non-Executive Director of a number of companies listed on the Hong Kong Stock Exchange, including China Merchant China Direct Investments Limited, PanAsialum Holdings Company Limited, Sihuan Pharmaceutical Holdings Group Ltd and TK Group (Holdings) Limited. WK is a Fellow Member of Hong Kong Institute of Certified Public Accountants, a Member of Chinese Institute of Certified Public Accountants and a Fellow Member of Association of Chartered Certified Accountants, UK. For additional information contact: Julian Daly General Manager, Strategy & Corporate Affairs +64 3 372 0972 End CA:00257485 For:PGW Type:DIRECTOR Time:2014-11-11 12:27:12
- Forums
- NZX - By Stock
- PGW
- Ann: DIRECTOR: PGW: PGG Wrightson Directorship Changes
Ann: DIRECTOR: PGW: PGG Wrightson Directorship Changes
Featured News
Add PGW (NZSX) to my watchlist
(20min delay)
|
|||||
Last
$1.73 |
Change
-0.020(1.14%) |
Mkt cap ! n/a |
Open | High | Low | Value | Volume |
$1.77 | $1.77 | $1.73 | $36.59K | 20.92K |
Buyers (Bids)
No. | Vol. | Price($) |
---|---|---|
0 | 2506 | $1.75 |
Sellers (Offers)
Price($) | Vol. | No. |
---|---|---|
$1.76 | 386 | 0 |
Last trade - 10.21am 04/10/2024 (20 minute delay) ? |
Featured News
NEWS
Antler Copper Project hits major permitting milestone – air quality permit advances to final review
PGW (NZSX) Chart |